Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/11/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/11/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/16/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/17/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/18/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/18/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/18/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/23/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/23/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/24/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/24/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/08/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/16/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/16/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/17/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/24/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 10/01/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/01/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/15/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/10/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/09/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/31/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew