There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 120 Baldwin Avenue in Paia, Maui, Hawaii, as the "Patsy Takemoto Mink Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
07/14/2003Became Public Law No: 108-57. (TXT | PDF)
07/14/2003Signed by President.
07/03/2003Presented to President.
06/25/2003Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8598-8599)
06/20/2003Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
06/10/2003Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5120)
05/08/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
07/14/2003Became Public Law No: 108-57. (TXT | PDF)
07/14/2003Signed by President.
07/03/2003HousePresented to President.
06/26/2003SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/25/2003SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8598-8599)
06/20/2003SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 164.
06/20/2003SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
06/17/2003SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/11/2003SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
06/10/2003-2:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/10/2003-2:49pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5120)
06/10/2003-2:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2030.
06/10/2003-2:06pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5120-5127)
06/10/2003-2:06pmHouseMs. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/22/2003HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
05/22/2003HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/08/2003HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
05/08/2003HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (116)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/08/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/08/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/08/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/08/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/08/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/08/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/08/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/09/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/09/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/09/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/09/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/09/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/09/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/09/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/09/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/09/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/14/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/14/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 05/14/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/14/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/14/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/14/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/14/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/21/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/21/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/02/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/02/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/04/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/09/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/10/2003

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform05/08/2003 Referred to
05/22/2003 Markup by
Senate Governmental Affairs06/11/2003 Referred to
06/17/2003 Markup by
06/20/2003 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.2030. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-57 (07/14/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the U.S. Postal Service facility located at 120 Baldwin Avenue in Paia, Maui, Hawaii, as the Patsy Takemoto Mink Post Office Building.