Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/08/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/08/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/04/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/18/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/08/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/03/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/03/2004
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/10/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/04/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/12/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/20/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/03/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/17/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/05/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/07/2004