Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 05/09/2003
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 05/09/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/09/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 05/09/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/21/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/05/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/05/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/19/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/25/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/25/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/25/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/03/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/03/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/03/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/05/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/05/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/05/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/05/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/05/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/05/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/09/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/09/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/09/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/10/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 09/10/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/24/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/24/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 09/24/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/24/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 09/24/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/30/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/30/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/30/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 09/30/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 09/30/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/02/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/02/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/02/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/16/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/16/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 10/16/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/16/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/29/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 10/29/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/29/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/07/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/28/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/28/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/28/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/28/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/09/2004
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/07/2004