Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/09/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/22/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/22/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/22/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/22/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/22/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/22/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/22/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/22/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/22/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/22/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/22/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/22/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/22/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/22/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/22/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/22/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/22/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/22/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/22/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/04/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/04/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/04/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 06/04/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/04/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/04/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/04/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/04/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/04/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/04/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/04/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/04/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/04/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 06/04/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/04/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/04/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/04/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/04/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/04/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/04/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/04/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/04/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/04/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/04/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/04/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/04/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/04/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/04/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/04/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/04/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/05/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/05/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/05/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/05/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/05/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/05/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/05/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/05/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/12/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/12/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/12/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/12/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/12/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/12/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/12/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/12/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/12/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/12/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/12/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/12/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/12/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/12/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/12/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/12/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/12/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/12/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/12/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/12/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/12/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/12/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/12/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/12/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/12/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/19/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/19/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 06/19/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/19/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/19/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/19/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/19/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/19/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/19/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/19/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/19/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/19/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/19/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/19/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/19/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/08/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/08/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/08/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/08/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/08/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/08/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/08/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/08/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/09/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/14/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/14/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/14/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/17/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 07/17/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/17/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/17/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/22/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/22/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/23/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 07/23/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/24/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/24/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/24/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/24/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/24/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/24/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/02/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/02/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/02/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/02/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 11/21/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/21/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/21/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/21/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/21/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/21/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/21/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/21/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/02/2004