Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/10/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/10/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/10/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/10/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/03/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/03/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/03/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/03/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/18/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/21/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/18/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/08/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 12/07/2004