Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 01/27/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/27/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/27/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/27/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/29/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/25/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/11/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/05/2003