Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22] 06/02/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/02/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/24/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/10/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/09/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/09/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/24/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/21/2004