Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/27/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 01/28/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/28/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 02/11/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/11/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/13/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/13/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/04/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/13/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/13/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/17/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/20/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/20/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/08/2003