Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/14/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/19/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/19/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/19/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/19/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/19/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/19/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/20/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/21/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/08/2004