Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/14/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/14/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/09/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/09/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/09/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 11/04/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/24/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/24/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/24/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/24/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/24/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/11/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/11/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/04/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/04/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/08/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/15/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/30/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/30/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/04/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/04/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/04/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/07/2004