Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 05/15/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/15/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/15/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/22/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/11/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/11/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/18/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/14/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/09/2003