Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/20/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/20/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 05/20/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/20/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/20/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/21/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/21/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/22/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 06/04/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/28/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 03/16/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew