Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/11/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/11/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/11/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/25/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/09/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/09/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/16/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/23/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/23/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/23/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/05/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/05/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/05/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/05/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 09/09/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/09/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/16/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/16/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/29/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/29/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/07/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/07/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/24/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/24/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/24/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/04/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/04/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/04/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/04/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/04/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/12/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/12/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 11/12/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/12/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/12/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/12/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 11/12/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/12/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/12/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 11/21/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 11/21/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/21/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/21/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/21/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/21/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 01/21/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/21/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/21/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/21/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/21/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 01/21/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/21/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/10/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/10/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/10/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/10/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/10/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/01/2004
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/01/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/01/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/01/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/03/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/03/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/11/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/11/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/11/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/24/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/24/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/24/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 04/26/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/26/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/30/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/30/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/17/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/17/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/06/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/06/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/08/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/08/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/08/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/12/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/12/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/14/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/22/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/23/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/04/2004