Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/20/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 05/21/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/21/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/09/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/16/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/17/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/25/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 06/25/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/25/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/23/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/23/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/23/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/23/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/04/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/04/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/04/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/24/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/20/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/20/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/20/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/24/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/28/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 01/21/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/10/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/03/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/09/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/02/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/21/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/26/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/26/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/26/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/26/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/01/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/02/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/02/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/02/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/08/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/08/2004
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/16/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/24/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/24/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/14/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/14/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/14/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/21/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/21/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/21/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/21/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/21/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/21/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/21/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/22/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/29/2004