Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/28/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/28/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/31/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/07/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/12/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/25/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/11/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/16/2004