Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/05/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/09/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/12/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/17/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 06/17/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/18/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/18/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/19/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/19/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/23/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/23/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/23/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/23/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/24/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/24/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/26/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/26/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/07/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 07/07/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/07/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/08/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/10/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/07/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/30/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/04/2004