Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/04/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/04/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/04/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/09/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/09/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/10/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/16/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/17/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/17/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/19/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/19/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/23/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/25/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/07/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 07/08/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/14/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/03/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/16/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/10/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/24/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/24/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/21/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/27/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/27/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/27/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/27/2004
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/27/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/27/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/27/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 04/27/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/27/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/28/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/28/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/06/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/06/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/06/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/06/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/06/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/01/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/01/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/06/2004