There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Popular Titles

Kevin's Law (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Meat and Poultry Pathogen Reduction and Enforcement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To clarify the authority of the Secretary of Agriculture to prescribe performance standards for the reduction of pathogens in meat, meat products, poultry, and poultry products processed by establishments receiving inspection services and to enforce the Hazard Analysis and Critical Control Point (HACCP) System requirements, sanitation requirements, and the performance standards.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/22/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
03/10/2004Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H939)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/11/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/03/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Horticulture.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
05/22/2003Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2003Referred to House Agriculture
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2003Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/02/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/02/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/04/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/04/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/05/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/05/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/19/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/26/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/23/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/23/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/23/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/09/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/09/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/25/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/01/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/01/2003
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 10/02/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/10/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/17/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/28/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/28/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/29/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/04/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/04/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/18/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/08/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/22/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/22/2004

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture05/22/2003 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock and Horticulture06/03/2003 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce05/22/2003 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/11/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2203. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/22/2003)

Meat and Poultry Pathogen Reduction and Enforcement Act - Amends the Federal Meat Inspection Act and the Poultry Products Inspection Act, respectively, to direct the Secretary of Agriculture to: (1) prescribe initial and final pathogen performance standards for raw meat and raw poultry, and meat and poultry products processed in establishments inspected under such Acts; (2) identify, and publish a list of, such pathogens; (3) initiate pathogen surveys to determine existing levels of meat and poultry contamination; (4) perform microbial compliance testing at such establishments, and prohibit non-complying establishments from labeling such products as "inspected and passed "; and (5) report on the scientific feasibility of establishing health-based performance standards for pathogens in raw meat and meat products.

Directs the Secretary to establish a National Advisory Committee for Microbiology Criteria for Foods.

Directs the Secretary to enforce Hazard Analysis and Critical Control Point (HACCP) System requirements and other sanitation requirements in any official establishment. Authorizes the Secretary to prohibit non-complying establishments from labeling any meat or meat product, or poultry or poultry product, as "inspected and passed."