Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/02/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/02/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/04/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/04/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/05/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/05/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/19/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/26/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/23/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/23/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/23/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/09/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/09/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/25/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/01/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/01/2003
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 10/02/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/10/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/17/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/28/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/28/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/29/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/04/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/04/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/18/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/08/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/22/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/22/2004