Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/13/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/13/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/13/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/13/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/13/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/13/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/13/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/13/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/20/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/20/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/20/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/20/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/20/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/20/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/20/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/20/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/20/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/20/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/20/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/20/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/20/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/20/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/20/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/20/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/31/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/31/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/13/2003