Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/19/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/19/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/19/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/19/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/25/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/25/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/25/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/25/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/09/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/09/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/09/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 07/14/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 07/14/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 07/14/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/14/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 07/14/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/17/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 07/17/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/03/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/01/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/29/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/18/2003

Show cosponsors who withdrew