Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/09/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/09/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/09/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/09/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/04/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/16/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/07/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/07/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/07/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/07/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 11/07/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/07/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/07/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/07/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/07/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/07/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/07/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/07/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/07/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/07/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/07/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/18/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/18/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/18/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/19/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/20/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/20/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/20/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/20/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/20/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/21/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/21/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/20/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/25/2004
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/31/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/22/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/12/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/13/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/19/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/19/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 05/20/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/20/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/20/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/02/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/02/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/02/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/02/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/03/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/09/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/23/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/25/2004