Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/11/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/18/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/18/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/16/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/16/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/16/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 10/01/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 12/08/2003