Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/03/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/03/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/03/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/24/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/24/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/16/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/17/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/17/2003