Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/22/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/22/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/23/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/23/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/23/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/23/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/23/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/23/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/23/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/23/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/23/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/23/2003
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 07/16/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/16/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/16/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/16/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/24/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/24/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/24/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/24/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/24/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/24/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/25/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/25/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/09/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 10/30/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/18/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 01/28/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/28/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/23/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/23/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/23/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/23/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/23/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/02/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/29/2004