Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/17/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/17/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/17/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/17/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/17/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/17/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/17/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/17/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/24/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/24/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/24/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/24/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/24/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/24/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/24/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/24/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/09/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/09/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/09/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/21/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/21/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/21/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/21/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/21/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/25/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/25/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/04/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/04/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/04/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/04/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/04/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/04/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/04/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/04/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/04/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/04/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/04/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/02/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/02/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/02/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/16/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/16/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/16/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/16/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/16/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/28/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/28/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 10/28/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/28/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/29/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/29/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/30/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/30/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/30/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/30/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/05/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/05/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/05/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/05/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/06/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/14/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/14/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 11/14/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/17/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/18/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 11/18/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/18/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/18/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/18/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/20/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/21/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/21/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/21/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/25/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/25/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 12/08/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/08/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/08/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/08/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 12/08/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/20/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/20/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 01/20/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/20/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/20/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 01/20/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 01/20/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/20/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/20/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/20/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 01/20/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 01/27/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 01/28/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/04/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/04/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/04/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/10/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/10/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/10/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/10/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/02/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/02/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/02/2004
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/02/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/10/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/30/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/30/2004
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/30/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/30/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/20/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/20/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/04/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/04/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/04/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/04/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/20/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/22/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/22/2004
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/24/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/08/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/15/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/21/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/09/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/09/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/22/2004
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/22/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/22/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/22/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/22/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/08/2004