Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/04/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/04/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/11/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/11/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/11/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/11/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/11/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 06/12/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/16/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/17/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/24/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/24/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/25/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/26/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/16/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/16/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/16/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/16/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/17/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/17/2003