Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/22/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/09/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/09/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/17/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/17/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/17/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/17/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/17/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/18/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/18/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/18/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/18/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/18/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/18/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/18/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/18/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/25/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/25/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/25/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/25/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/25/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/25/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/25/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/25/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/25/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 06/25/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/25/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/25/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/25/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/25/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/25/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/25/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/25/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/25/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/25/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/10/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/10/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/10/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/10/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/10/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 07/10/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/10/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/10/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/09/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/09/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/09/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/09/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/09/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/09/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/09/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/09/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/09/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/09/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/09/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/09/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/09/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/09/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/09/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/09/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/09/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/24/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/24/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/24/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/24/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/24/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/24/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/07/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/07/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/07/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/07/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/07/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/07/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/07/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 10/28/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/28/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/28/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/28/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 10/28/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/28/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/06/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 11/06/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/06/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/08/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/08/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/08/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/08/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 12/08/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/27/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 01/27/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/27/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/27/2004
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 02/25/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/25/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/16/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/20/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/30/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/30/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/30/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/30/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/30/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/30/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/30/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/02/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/03/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/08/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/08/2004
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/08/2004
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/15/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/15/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/15/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/15/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/15/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/23/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/23/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/19/2004