Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/22/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/22/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/22/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/22/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/22/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/03/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/03/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/03/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/05/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/05/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/05/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/05/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/10/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/16/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/17/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/23/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/23/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/08/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/08/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/17/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/28/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/29/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/29/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/05/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/05/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 11/05/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/20/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/03/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/03/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 02/11/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/11/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/24/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/02/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/20/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/24/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/28/2004
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/06/2004