Refine your search

8 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
02/13/2004 Became Public Law No: 108-200.
02/13/2004 Signed by President.
02/04/2004 Presented to President.
02/03/2004 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.
12/09/2003 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
12/09/2003 Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/07/2003 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9245-9246)
05/22/2003 Introduced in House