Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/02/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/02/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/11/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/11/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/11/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/11/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/11/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/11/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/11/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/11/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/11/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/11/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/24/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/24/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/24/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/25/2003