Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/22/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/02/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/11/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/11/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/11/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/23/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/15/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/15/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/25/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/23/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/26/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/30/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/20/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/20/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/20/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/20/2004
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 09/14/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/28/2004
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/28/2004