Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/10/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/09/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/09/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/10/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 09/25/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/25/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/29/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/29/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/16/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/25/2004