Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 06/02/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/02/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/03/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/03/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/03/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/04/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/04/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/04/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/09/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/09/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/10/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/10/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/11/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/11/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/12/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/19/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/23/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/08/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/16/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/07/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/16/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/21/2004