Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 06/04/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/12/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/26/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/10/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/10/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/17/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/17/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/22/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/22/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/23/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/25/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/04/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/09/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/09/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/24/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/02/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/02/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/16/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/04/2003