Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/05/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 06/05/2003
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/05/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/09/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/09/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/09/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 06/10/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/10/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/10/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/10/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/10/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/10/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/10/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/11/2003
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/11/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/12/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/16/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/16/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/16/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/16/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/17/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/17/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/18/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/18/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/19/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/23/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/24/2003