Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/17/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/17/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/17/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/17/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/17/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/25/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/25/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/25/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/25/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/10/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/10/2003