Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/05/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/16/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/16/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/16/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/16/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/16/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/16/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/16/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/16/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/16/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/16/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/16/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/16/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/28/2004