Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/10/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/25/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/03/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/03/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/10/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/10/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/10/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/16/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/24/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/24/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/07/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/28/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/05/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/28/2004