Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/24/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/28/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/28/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/28/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/05/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/05/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/13/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/18/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/18/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 05/18/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/19/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/20/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/20/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/01/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/01/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/01/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/01/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/08/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/08/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/08/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/08/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/15/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/24/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/09/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/09/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/13/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/15/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/15/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/19/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/19/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/19/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/19/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/22/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/08/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/08/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/14/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/14/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/21/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/21/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/21/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/19/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/19/2004