There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1210 Highland Avenue in Duarte, California, as the "Francisco A. Martinez Flores Post Office".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/11/2003Became Public Law No: 108-116. (TXT | PDF)
11/11/2003Signed by President.
11/03/2003Presented to President.
10/29/2003Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S13531-13532)
10/27/2003Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
07/08/2003Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6310-6311)
06/09/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
11/11/2003Became Public Law No: 108-116. (TXT | PDF)
11/11/2003Signed by President.
11/03/2003HousePresented to President.
10/30/2003SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/29/2003SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S13531-13532)
10/27/2003SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 341.
10/27/2003SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
10/22/2003SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/09/2003SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
07/08/2003-2:12pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/08/2003-2:12pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6310-6311)
07/08/2003-1:57pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2396.
07/08/2003-1:57pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6310-6312)
07/08/2003-1:57pmHouseMr. Davis, Tom moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/19/2003HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
06/19/2003HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/09/2003HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
06/09/2003HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5060)
06/09/2003HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 06/09/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 06/09/2003

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform06/09/2003 Referred to
06/19/2003 Markup by
Senate Governmental Affairs07/09/2003 Referred to
10/22/2003 Markup by
10/27/2003 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.2396.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.2396. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-116 (11/11/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the U.S. Postal Service facility located at 1210 Highland Avenue in Duarte, California, as the Francisco A. Martinez Flores Post Office.