Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 01/27/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/27/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 01/27/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/27/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/05/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/05/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/11/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/11/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/27/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/13/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/21/2003