Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/10/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/10/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 06/10/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/10/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 06/10/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/11/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/11/2003
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/12/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/16/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/04/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/10/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/16/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/30/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/01/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/17/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 11/17/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 11/17/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/17/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/18/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 11/18/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 11/18/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/18/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 11/18/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 11/18/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/19/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 11/19/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/20/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/20/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 01/20/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/20/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/20/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 01/20/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/21/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/21/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/21/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/27/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/04/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/09/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/16/2004
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/16/2004
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/30/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/30/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/30/2004
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/31/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/27/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 04/30/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/30/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/04/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/04/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/04/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/04/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/05/2004
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/11/2004
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/01/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 06/08/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/08/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/08/2004
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/08/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 06/08/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/16/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/16/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/08/2004