There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Beneficiary Fairness Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to repeal the two-year limitation on the payment of accrued benefits that are due and unpaid by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs upon the death of a veteran or other beneficiary under laws administered by the Secretary.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/08/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
12/16/2003See Public Law 108-183.
11/19/2003Similar provision incorporated. See H. R. 2297, Title I, Section 104.
05/15/2003Provision incorporated. See H. R. 1460, Section 6.
05/07/2003Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits
05/07/2003Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits
04/10/2003Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits
02/20/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/08/2003Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/08/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E51)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/08/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (13)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs01/08/2003 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits02/20/2003 Referred to
04/10/2003 Hearings by
05/07/2003 Markup by
05/07/2003 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.241. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/08/2003)

Veterans Beneficiary Fairness Act of 2003 - Repeals the limitation (benefits due and unpaid for not to exceed two years) on the accrued benefits required to be paid by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs upon the death of a veteran or other beneficiary.