Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/11/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/16/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/16/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/16/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/19/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/19/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/19/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/19/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/19/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/23/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/23/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/23/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/23/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/24/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/24/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/24/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/24/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/08/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/08/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/08/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/08/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/08/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 07/16/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/22/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/22/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/03/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/04/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/09/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/09/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/09/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/16/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/16/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/07/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/15/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/29/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/04/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/03/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 03/23/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/25/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/04/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/14/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/22/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/22/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/08/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/30/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/08/2004