Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/16/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/16/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/16/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/16/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/19/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/19/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/19/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/19/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/24/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 06/24/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/24/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/08/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/08/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/08/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/08/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/15/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/15/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/18/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/18/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/18/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/18/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/23/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/23/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/23/2003