There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Health Care for Veterans of Project 112/Project SHAD Act of 2003

Short Titles as Reported to House

Health Care for Veterans of Project 112/Project SHAD Act of 2003

Short Titles as Introduced

Health Care for Veterans of Project 112/Project SHAD Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide veterans who participated in certain Department of Defense chemical and biological warfare testing with health care for their illness without requirement for proof of service-connection.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide veterans who participated in certain Department of Defense chemical and biological warfare testing to be provided health care for illness without requirement for proof of service-connection.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/10/2003Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8094-8095)
07/16/2003Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 108-213.
06/11/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
09/11/2003SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
09/10/2003-11:03amHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/10/2003-11:03amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/10/2003-11:03amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8094-8095)
09/10/2003-10:40amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2433.
09/10/2003-10:40amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8094-8097)
09/10/2003-10:39amHouseMr. Smith (NJ) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
08/18/2003HouseUnfavorable Executive Comment Received from Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/16/2003HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 119.
07/16/2003HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 108-213.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/26/2003HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/26/2003HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/24/2003HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
06/24/2003HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
06/20/2003HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/11/2003HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
06/11/2003HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs06/11/2003 Referred to
06/26/2003 Markup by
07/16/2003 Reported by H. Rept. 108-213
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health06/20/2003 Referred to
06/24/2003 Markup by
06/24/2003 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs09/11/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2433. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (07/16/2003)

Health Care for Veterans of Project 112/Project SHAD Act of 2003 - Makes a veteran who participated in a test conducted by the Department of Defense Deseret Test Center as part of a program for chemical and biological warfare testing from 1962 through 1973 (including the program designated as Project Shipboard Hazard and Defense (SHAD) and related land-based tests) eligible for hospital care, medical services, and nursing home care through the Department of Veterans Affairs for any illness, notwithstanding that there is insufficient medical evidence to conclude that such illness is attributable to such testing. Terminates such eligibility after December 31, 2005.

(Sec. 3) Prohibits the lack of a baccalaureate degree in nursing from being a bar to, or resulting in the denial of, a promotion to the next higher grade for a Veterans Health Administration (VHA) registered nurse who has accomplished required performance elements.

(Sec. 4) Authorizes additional pay for Saturday VHA nursing duty.

(Sec. 5) Allows: (1) employees of the Veterans' Canteen Service (Service) to be considered for appointment to a Department position in the competitive service in the same manner that Department employees in the competitive service are considered for transfer to Service positions; and (2) former Service employees to count their previous period of employment toward the time-in-service requirement of a Department position in the competitive service.