Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/17/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/17/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/23/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/23/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/23/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/25/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/26/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/26/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/26/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/10/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/10/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/15/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/15/2003