Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/12/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/26/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/26/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/25/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/25/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/25/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/26/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/26/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/26/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/16/2004